+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (67)
On April 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/11/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/12 CHAPTER 13 SLA 94
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- 1:22 PM 3/28/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y11 N8 A1
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N11
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- AM NO 9 BY ULMER, MACLEAN, HOFFMAN,
- READ THE 3RD TIME HCS CSSB 77(RES) AM H
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 9 PSD Y27 N11 E2
- FOSTER, MACKIE, NICHOLIA, DAVIDSON,
- BROWN, JAMES, DAVIES, HUDSON, NAVARRE
- AM NO 9 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y29 N8 E2 A1
- ULMER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y9 N24 E7
- IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N21 E7
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N21 E7 A1
- AM NO 3 BY FINKELSTEIN
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N22 E7
- AM NO 4 BY FINKELSTEIN
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y10 N22 E7 A1
- AM NO 5 BY FINKELSTEIN
- AM NO 2 BY FINKELSTEIN
- AM NO 6 BY MACLEAN
- AM NO 7 BY ULMER
- RETURN TO FINANCE/WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y12 N21 E7
- AM NO 8 BY ULMER
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y11 N22 E7
- OBJECTION TO ADVANCEMENT MOTION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/94
- HOLD IN 2ND TO 3/18 CAL PSD Y23 N16 E1
- RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 BY MACLEAN
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 3/9/94
- NR: HUDSON, JAMES, BUNDE, WILLIAMS
- DNP: FINKELSTEIN
- DP: MULDER
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 1DP 1DNP 4NR
On January 13, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
On March 15, 1993 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 12, 1993 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N8 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y11 N8 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 77(RES)
On March 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES RPT 3 CAL 1NR 3/10/93
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FAILED Y11 N8 E1
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- THIRD READING 3/11 CALENDAR
On February 26, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (F&G)
- RES RPT CS 2DP 3DNP 1NR NEW TITLE
On February 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: MILLER
On January 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)