+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 107 SLA 14
- 1:30 PM 7/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 77(RES)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GARA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 77(RES)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- AM: KAWASAKI, TARR
- NR: JOHNSON, HAWKER
- DP: OLSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 4DP 2NR 2AM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 77(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 77(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
- NR: OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- DP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, DYSON
- RES RPT CS 6DP SAME TITLE
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- BILL REPRINTED 2/24/14
- COSPONSOR(S) ADDED: KELLY
- PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: MICCICHE REPLACED KELLY
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS