+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/22/97
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/23 CHAPTER 11 SLA 97
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- 3:05 PM 4/9/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN, JAMES, OGAN
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 77
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 1, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA) 2/26/97
- NR: BERKOWITZ
- DP: JAMES, ELTON, DYSON, VEZEY, IVAN
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUSSENDORF
- STATE AFFAIRS
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- SHARP, MILLER, KELLY, TORGERSON, MACKIE
- WARD, GREEN, PEARCE, HALFORD, DUNCAN,
- COSPONSOR(S): LEMAN, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 77
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/97
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
- DP: GREEN, MILLER, WARD
- STA RPT 3DP
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor