+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/28/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/27 CHAPTER 18 SLA 01
On April 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- 9:00 AM 4/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, JAMES
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: STEVENS, CHENAULT, GREEN, MCGUIRE,
- FATE, KERTTULA, MASEK, SCALZI
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/01
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSSB 76
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SSSB 76
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- DP: KOHRING, DYSON, JOULE, GUESS, FATE
- O&G RPT 5DP
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HARRIS
- O&G, RES
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: SSSB 76
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/01
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSSB 76
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- NR: LINCOLN, ELTON
- DP: TORGERSON, PEARCE, HALFORD;
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS