+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 25 SLA 21
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3:00 P.M. 8/13/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- TRA RPT 7DP
- DP: DRUMMOND, CRONK, MCCABE, MCKAY, SPOHNHOLZ, HANNAN, HOPKINS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N33 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 76
- PASSED Y38 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 76
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, JOHNSON, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, VANCE
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 76
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 76
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N33 A2