+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 10:25AM 7/08/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 135 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/1/04
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y12 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 71(FIN)
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 71(FIN)
- PASSED Y26 N10 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N9 E2 A2
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N21 E2 A8
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N22 E2 A7
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N24 E2 A5
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, CHENAULT,
- WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: MOSES; AM: KERTTULA, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- TRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: FATE, HOLM; NR: KOHRING, MASEK
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG#1, STOLTZE#2
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 71(TRA)
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 71(TRA)
- PASSED Y11 N7 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N- E2
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO 3RD READING FAILED Y12 N7 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/17 CALENDAR
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(TRA) 2DP 5NR
- DP: WILKEN, STEVENS B; NR: GREEN,
- TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: COWDERY, OLSON, WAGONER;
- NR: THERRIAULT; AM: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN