+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/20/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 66 SLA 99
- 8:15 AM 6/4/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N4
On May 18, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y36 A4
- READ THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 71(HES) AM H
On May 17, 1999 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- HES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 16, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/99
On May 15, 1999 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/28/99
- NR: MURKOWSKI, BRICE
- DP: ROKEBERG, HARRIS, CISSNA, HALCRO;
- L&C RPT HCS(HES) 4DP 2NR
On May 14, 1999 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/28/99
- COGHILL
- DP: GREEN, DYSON, WHITAKER, BRICE,
- HES RPT HCS(HES) 5DP
On May 7, 1999 in the House:
- HES, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 6, 1999 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y16 N- A4 CSSB 71(RLS) AM
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/6
On May 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CAL W/CS & 1 OR 5/4 SAME TITLE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 71(RLS)
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- MILLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- DP: MACKIE, TIM KELLY; NR: DONLEY
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On April 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- NR: PEARCE
- DP: MILLER, WILKEN, ELTON, PETE KELLY;
- HES RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- HES, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor