+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 69 SLA 14
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- ENGROSSED & SENT TO SENATE
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 71(FIN) AM H
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RESCIND ACTION IN PASSING UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 71(FIN) AM H
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 71(FIN) AM H
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, MCGUIRE, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, EGAN, BISHOP, DYSON
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED Y36 A4
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2014
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 7DP 4NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 31
- DP: GARA, HOLMES, THOMPSON, MUNOZ, EDGMON, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
- NR: GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, T.WILSON, STOLTZE
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 71(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT
- ENGROSSED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 71(FIN)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 71(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y15 N- E5
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 71(FIN)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: MEYER, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH
- RES RPT 4DP
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor