+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/25/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 36 SLA 93
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- 11:40 AM 5/7/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 27, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ULMER, MENARD
- SENATE LETTER OF INTENT ADOPTED
- PASSED Y40 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSSSB 71(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- HES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 26, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/93
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HANLEY, MARTIN
- FIN RPT HCS CSSS(HES) 11DP
- DP: NAVARRE, BROWN, THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- -FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/DHSS) 4/24/93
- DP: PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF, HOFFMAN
On April 13, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS SEN ZERO FN (DCED) 3/9/93
- -FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 4/13/93
- SENATE LETTER OF INTENT WITH HES REPORT
- NR: VEZEY, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, OLBERG
- DP: KOTT, TOOHEY, B.DAVIS, NICHOLIA
- HES RPT HCS CSSS(HES) 4DP 4NR
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 71(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- PASSED Y20 N- CSSSSB 71(FIN) AM
- (S) ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT
On March 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- KERTTULA, LITTLE, ZHAROFF
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, DUNCAN, DONLEY,
- THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FAILED Y11 N9
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES 2 CALENDAR 1NR 3/23/93
On March 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 7DP
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN APPLIES (DCED)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO CS (S.FIN/DHSS)
On March 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- HES RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 26, 1993 in the Senate:
- HES, LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On January 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- HES, LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor