+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (63)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- FN8: (EED)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- 9:04 A.M. 6/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 18 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 71(STA)
- PASSED Y25 N12 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N6
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WOOL, SCHRAGE, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 71(STA)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA HCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
On May 14, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2022
- SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(STA) 9DP 1NR
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK,
- FOSTER
- NR: CARPENTER
- FN4: (GOV/FUND CAP)
- FN7: (ADM)
- FN8: (EED)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 4DP 3AM
- DP: TARR, CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
- AM: VANCE, EASTMAN, KAUFMAN
- FN4: (GOV/FUND CAP)
- FN5: (ADM)
- FN6: (EED)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 71(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 71(FIN)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF
- NR: WILSON, OLSON
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN3: (EED)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 4NR
- NR: SHOWER, COSTELLO, KAWASAKI, REINBOLD
- DP: HOLLAND
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: (EED)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor