+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- 8:50 AM 5/30/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 89 SLA 97
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/14/97
On May 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E1 A1
On May 10, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE 3RD TIME HCS CSSB 70(FIN) AM H
- PASSED Y37 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 9, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y27 N9 A4
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y24 N11 A5
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE, CROFT
On May 7, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 3NR
- DP: MULDER, MARTIN, KOHRING, DAVIS
- NR: DAVIES, KELLY, FOSTER
- FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
- SENATE FN (ADM) 4/10/97
- SENATE FN (LAW) 4/9/97
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (ADM, COR) 4/10/97
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DPS, DHSS) 2/21/97
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 2DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, PORTER; NR: CROFT, BERKOWITZ
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 4/9/97
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 4/10/97
- 2 SEN ZERO FNS (DPS, DHSS) 2/21/97
- 3 SEN ZERO FNS (COR, COURT, ADM) 4/10/97
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On April 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 70(JUD)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- COSPONSOR(S): PEARCE, LEMAN, GREEN,
- WILKEN, MACKIE, PHILLIPS, ELLIS,
- WARD, DUNCAN, KELLY
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT (JUD)CS 6DP 1NR
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- TORGERSON, DONLEY; NR: ADAMS
- FN TO CS (ADM-PD)
- PREVIOUS FN (LAW)
- ZERO FNS TO CS (COR, COURT, ADM-PA)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DPS, DHSS)
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (LAW)
On April 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PEARCE
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD; NR: ELLIS
- FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- INDETERMINATE FNS (ADM, COURT)
- ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS, HES)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor