+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/22
- 4:00 P.M. 7/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 45 SLA 22
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL
- VERSION: CSSB 7(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y29 N9 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 7(JUD)
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 14, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2022
- SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR
- SESSION CANCELED 5/12 - ON 5/13 CALENDAR
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, KURKA, VANCE
- DNP: EASTMAN
- DP: SNYDER, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- NR: KAUFMAN, VANCE
- STA RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: CLAMAN, TARR, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
- AM: EASTMAN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 7(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y13 N- E6 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 7(JUD)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2022
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/8 CAL
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: HUGHES, SHOWER
- DP: MYERS, KIEHL
- AM: HOLLAND
- JUD RPT CS 1AM 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: SHOWER, HOLLAND, COSTELLO
- STA RPT 3NR 1AM
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21