+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 21 SLA 13
- 1:30 PM 5/22/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 7(FIN)
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N29 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y31 N4 E2 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, FEIGE, LEDOUX, TUCK, TARR, JOSEPHSON,
- HIGGINS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 7(FIN)
On April 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 14
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO
- DNP: GARA
- NR: EDGMON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: (REV)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, T.WILSON, HOLMES, COSTELLO
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 7 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, KELLY
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH, DYSON, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER,
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/1 CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 7 AM
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/28 CALENDAR
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2013
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): EGAN
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor