+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 16 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/6/95
On April 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- 3:30 PM 4/19/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
On April 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On April 12, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 68(HES)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- HES RPT HCS(HES) TECH TITLE CHANGE 5DP
- DP: BUNDE, TOOHEY, VEZEY, ROBINSON
- DP: BRICE
- SENATE ZERO FN (DEC) 2/16/95
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- FSH REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FISHERIES & HES
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) CSSB 68(HES) AM
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, PEARCE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 68(HES)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- LEMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- HES RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- ZERO FN (DEC)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES