+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 65(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, MEYER, WILSON, HUGHES, COSTELLO, MACKINNON, GIESSEL
- VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 65(RES)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- FN5: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- FN6: ZERO(DNR)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- PRIME SPONSOR: SHOWER UC
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN, MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor