+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/23/04
- 11:02AM 6/29/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/22 CHAPTER 160 SLA 04
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- PASSED Y38 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 65(FIN)
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NOS 1 - 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HARRIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 65(FIN)
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- HARRIS; AM: STOLTZE, CROFT
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 5DP 4NR 2AM
- DP: HAWKER, CHENAULT, FATE, FOSTER,
- WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER, JOULE, MOSES,
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FN2: (COR)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/9/04
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- DYSON; NR: OLSON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2004
- FN2: (COR)
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, HOFFMAN, STEVENS B,
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- RESCIND ACTION IN ADOPTING AM NO.3 UC
- MOVE TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- AM NO 3 WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- VERSION: CSSB 65(FIN) AM
- BUNDE, STEDMAN, DAVIS, LINCOLN
- AM NO 4 OFFERED BY WAGONER
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS G, DYSON, COWDERY
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 65(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- GREEN ADDED AS COSPONSOR TO AM 4
- AM NO 4 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM TO AM 4 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (COR)
- DP: HOFFMAN, GUESS; AM: DYSON
- NR: STEVENS G, COWDERY;
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor