+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- STEVENS G, LINCOLN, WAGONER, SEEKINS
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2003
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS B, THERRIAULT,
- TAYLOR, COWDERY, GUESS, DYSON,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- OLSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 64(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 64(JUD)
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH,
- THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- AM: SEEKINS
- NR: BUNDE; DP: DAVIS, FRENCH;
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIS
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor