+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (95)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 12:02 PM 7/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/17 CHAPTER 60 SLA 18
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UC
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 29
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y35 N4 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y29 N10 A1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N21 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 63(RLS) AM H
- PASSED Y32 N7 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 29
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, CLAMAN, SADDLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 63(RLS) AM H
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N2 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- NR: STUTES, CHENAULT
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 1DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM
- PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
- DP: CLAMAN
- DNP: EASTMAN
- FN11: ZERO(DOT)
- AM: REINBOLD, LEDOUX
- FN8: ZERO(DEC)
- FN9: ZERO(DHS)
- FN10: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(CED)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- AM: EASTMAN, LEDOUX
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN
- NR: REINBOLD
- FN10: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(CED)
- FN8: ZERO(DEC)
- FN9: ZERO(DHS)
- FN11: ZERO(DOT)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FANSLER
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PARISH
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, PRUITT, JOHNSTON, JOHNSON, WOOL, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
On May 13, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- AM: FANSLER
- DP: TALERICO, DRUMMOND, PARISH
- NR: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, RAUSCHER
- CRA RPT HCS(CRA) 3DP 3NR 1AM
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(DOT)
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, GRENN, KAWASAKI, BIRCH
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KITO
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- CRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 63(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 63(FIN)
- PASSED Y15 N5
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
- NR: DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(DOT)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN5: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
- HSS RPT 5DP
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, GARDNER, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor