+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/8 CHAPTER 9 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/7/98
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- 1:55 PM, 3/23/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E2
- COSPONSOR: MACKIE
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RYAN
- PASSED Y33 E6 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 63(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/98
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- MARTIN, KOHRING; NR: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 2NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, KELLY, MULDER
- 2 INDETERMINATE FNS (ADM)
- FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- INDETERMINATE FN (COURT)
- 2 ZERO FNS (DPS, DHSS)
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/27/97
- SEN FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 4/1/97
- SEN INDETERMINATE FN (S.FIN/COR) 4/10/97
- SEN INDETERMINATE FN (ADM) 3/27/97
- NR: CROFT
- DP: ROKEBERG, PORTER, GREEN, JAMES
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On April 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N3 E3
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- GREEN, SHARP
- COSPONSOR(S): LEMAN, PEARCE, KELLY,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 63
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/97
On April 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- TORGERSON, DONLEY; NR: ADAMS
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- PREVIOUS IND FN (ADM)
- INDETERMINATE FN (S.FIN/COR)
- PREVIOUS FN (COURT)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DPS)
On April 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTES (COURT, COR)
On March 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- INDT FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS)
- DP: TAYLOR, PEARCE, MILLER
- JUD RPT 3DP
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor