+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/13
- 9:27 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 58 SLA 13
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 63(STA)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 63(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOHNSON
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: CSSB 63(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 63(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 6DP
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor