+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 49 SLA 13
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1:40 PM 6/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
- VERSION: SB 62
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 62
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: HOLMES, THOMPSON, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, GARA, EDGMON, COSTELLO, NEUMAN
- FIN RPT 8DP 1AM
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DYSON, STEVENS, STEDMAN, MCGUIRE, MEYER, BISHOP, EGAN,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 62
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- FIN
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- KELLY
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 62
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: MEYER, KELLY, HOFFMAN, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, OLSON
- FIN RPT 7DP
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor