+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On May 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/31/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/2 CHAPTER 14 SLA 95
On April 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- 8:15 AM 4/14/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 62
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/95
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FN (DHSS) 2/15/95
- NR: BRICE
- DP: ROBINSON
- DP: ROKEBERG, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- HES RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- HEALTH, EDUCATION & SOCIAL SERVICES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 62
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/95
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor