+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (S) JOURNAL SUP NO. 4
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 8 SLA 11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/10/11
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- 4:06 PM 4/22/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 61(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2011
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 61(STA)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: PRUITT, HOLMES, KELLER, LYNN, GATTO
- JUD RPT 5DP
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 61(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: CSSB 61(STA)
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: COGHILL
- DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 3DP 1NR
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: KOOKESH, PASKVAN, GIESSEL
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER
- STA RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
Type:
Primary Sponsor