+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 28 SLA 01
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/7/01
On April 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- 9:45 AM 4/27/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On April 20, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 60(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y30 N9 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 60(RES)
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N23 E3
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR); FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- KERTTULA
- NR: STEVENS, GREEN; AM: KAPSNER,
- DP: CHENAULT, MCGUIRE, MASEK, SCALZI;
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 4DP 2NR 2AM
On April 6, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N2 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N4 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- VERSION: CSSB 60(JUD) AM
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 4/4/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 60(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR); FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: TAYLOR, DONLEY, THERRIAULT
- JUD RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS