+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN5: (EED/FUND CAP)
- FN3: (EED)
- FN2: (EED)
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- FN4: (EED)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- DP: STEVENS, BEGICH
- EDC RPT CS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- NR: COGHILL, HUGHES, COSTELLO
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL
- EDC, FIN
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, KIEHL
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19