+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (68)
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- FN11: (CRT)
- FN2: (CRT)
On June 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/3/11
- FN10: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 108
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN7: (LAW)
- FN8: ZERO(GOV)
- FN9: ZERO(COR)
On June 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/11
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 11 SLA 11
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- 10:32 AM 5/4/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 58
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 58
On April 16, 2011 in the House:
- FN11: (CRT)
- FN10: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN9: ZERO(COR)
- FN8: ZERO(GOV)
- FN7: (LAW)
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN2: (CRT)
- NR: STOLTZE
- THOMAS
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, GARA, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN,
- FIN RPT 9DP 1NR
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 58
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2011
- VERSION: SB 58
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CRT)
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
- DP: MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- NR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON
- FN1: (CRT)
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN7: (LAW)
- FN8: ZERO(GOV)
- FN9: ZERO(COR)
- FN10: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN4: (ADM)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CRT)
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MCGUIRE
- NR: FRENCH, COGHILL
- FN1: (CRT)
- FN5: (DPS)
- FN3: (ADM)
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN6: (COR)
- FN7: (LAW)
- FN8: ZERO(GOV)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor