+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (77)
On June 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/16/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/18 CHAPTER 36 SLA 06
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:47 PM 5/5/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, DAHLSTROM, LYNN, KELLY
- VERSION: CSSB 54(FIN)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 54(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2006
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- FIN RPT 8DP
- DP: HAWKER, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, KERTTULA, STOLTZE, MOSES, FOSTER, MEYER
- FN5: ZERO(COR)
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN7: ZERO(ADM)
- FN9: (DPS)
- FN10: ZERO(LAW)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, STOLTZE, FOSTER
- FN8: (DPS)
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, MCGUIRE
- FN10: ZERO(LAW)
- FN9: (DPS)
- FN8: (DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(ADM)
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN5: ZERO(COR)
- DP: GARA, WILSON, ANDERSON, KOTT, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT 6DP
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 54(FIN)
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 2/9 CALENDAR
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 54(FIN)
- COWDERY, STEVENS, B, STEVENS G, OLSON, WAGONER
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE, HUGGINS, SEEKINS, KOOKESH, ELTON, DAVIS, STEDMAN, GREEN,
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/6/06
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN10: ZERO(LAW)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN5: ZERO(COR)
- FIN RPT CS 7DP NEW TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, DYSON, STEDMAN, BUNDE
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN8: (DPS)
- FN9: (DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(ADM)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On April 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- JUD CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On March 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- JUD RPT CS FORTHCOMING 5DP
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, GUESS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FN4: (DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN4: (DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: DAVIS, ELTON, WAGONER, HUGGINS
- NR: THERRIAULT
- STA RPT CS 1NR 4AM NEW TITLE
On January 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor