+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/17 CHAPTER 11 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/16/03
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- 8:50 AM 4/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 54
- PASSED Y39 E1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 54
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, HEINZE,
- ANDERSON
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT 6DP
- DP: CRAWFORD, ROKEBERG, DAHLSTROM,
- GUTTENBERG, LYNN, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 7, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 54
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 54
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 5DP
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, DAVIS, FRENCH,
- STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: COWDERY, OLSON, THERRIAULT,
- WAGONER, LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, L&C