+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- 11:31 A.M. 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 21 SLA 19
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 54
- PASSED Y36 N1 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 54
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- TRA RPT 7DP
- DP: TALERICO, STORY, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, WOOL, STUTES
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 54
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 54
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 5NR
- DP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
- NR: STEDMAN, SHOWER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 4DP
- DP: HUGHES, WILSON, SHOWER, KIEHL
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor