+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- EDC RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
- DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, HUGHES, BIRCH
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- EDC WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC, FIN
- COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, BISHOP, HUGHES, COGHILL