+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 1:30 PM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 89 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/1/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 53
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- GATTO NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 53
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, MCGUIRE, GARA,
- DAHLSTROM, WILSON
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT 7DP
- DP: HOLM, GARA, SAMUELS, ANDERSON,
- GRUENBERG, OGG, MCGUIRE
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTO
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: OGG, KOOKESH, KOHRING, FATE, HOLM
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, JUD
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 53
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 53
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN; NR: TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN, FRENCH, ELLIS;
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: COWDERY, LINCOLN;
- NR: WAGONER, THERRIAULT, OLSON
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, JUD
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor