+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 14 SLA 05
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- 1:15 PM 4/21/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- STOP DEBATE ON AM 1 FAILED Y15 N17 E7 A1
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N18 E7
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 52(L&C)
- PASSED Y33 E7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 52(L&C)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, ANDERSON;
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- EDT RPT 3DP 3NR
- DP: COGHILL, CRAWFORD, DAHLSTROM;
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: LYNN, RAMRAS, NEUMAN
On March 4, 2005 in the House:
- EDT, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 52(L&C)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 52(L&C)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: ELLIS
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor