+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, JUD
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 51(TRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y14 N5 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 51(TRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- DP: FRENCH
- JUD RPT CS(TRA) 1DP 1DNP 2NR
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- DNP: THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- AM: DAVIS, PASKVAN
- NR: MEYER
- DP: KOOKESH
- TRA RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- TRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor