+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 5(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- CRA, STA, JUD
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- REMAIN IN SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N14
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ENGROSSED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N13
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 5(JUD)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: COGHILL, KELLY, COSTELLO, MEYER
- JUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: DUNLEAVY, WILSON
- DP: EGAN, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor