+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (78)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- FN4: (DHS)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- FN4: (DHS)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/16/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/17 CHAPTER 8 SLA 14
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y13 N7
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- LYNN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y23 N17
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N17
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
- VERSION: HCS SSSB 49(FIN) AM H
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N21
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SSSB 49(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y35 N5
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- BEFORE HOUSE WITH AM NO 3 PENDING
- AM NO 3 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y18 N22
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y20 N20
- HELD TO 4/13 CALENDAR
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2014
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 5DP 5DNP 1AM
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 23
- DP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE
- DNP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, EDGMON, HOLMES, AUSTERMAN
- AM: MUNOZ
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN4: (DHS)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SSSB 49 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- READ THE THIRD TIME SSSB 49
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N13
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N14
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y14 N6
- COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- NR: BISHOP, HOFFMAN
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- DNP: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: COGHILL, DYSON, OLSON
- JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor