+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- 10:00 AM 5/23/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 81 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/13/95
On May 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO SUPPLEMENTAL CAL 5/09
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 46(RLS) AM H
- PASSED Y34 E1 A5
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- FIN RPT 1DP 8NR 1AM
- DP: MARTIN
- NR: FOSTER, MULDER, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: KOHRING, NAVARRE, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- AM: BROWN
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 3/6/95
- SENATE ZERO FN (ADM) 3/22/95
- SENATE ZERO FN (LAW) 3/6/95
On April 22, 1995 in the House:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: PORTER, GREEN, TOOHEY
- NR: BUNDE
- AM: FINKELSTEIN
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 3/6/95
- SENATE ZERO FN (LAW) 3/6/95
- SENATE ZERO FN (ADM) 3/22/95
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT CS AND CAL 4/7 NEW TITLE
- PREVIOUS FN (COURT)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (LAW, ADM)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 46(RLS)
- COSPONSOR(S) PHILLIPS, LEMAN
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- ZERO FN TO CS (ADM)
- PREVIOUS FN (COURT)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (LAW)
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT W/ AM 3DP 1NR (NEW TITLE)
- FISCAL NOTES TO SB (COURT, LAW)
- FN TO SB W/AM (COURT)
- ZERO FNS TO SB & SB W/AM (DHSS-3)
- ZERO FN TO SB W/AMENDMENT (LAW)
- ADDITIONAL REFERRAL TO FIN
On January 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY