+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (60)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 9/8/22
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:00 A.M. 8/24/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 16
- LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 45(FIN) AM H
- PASSED Y31 N9
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N6
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 45(FIN) AM H
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y23 N15 E2
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N19 E3 A1
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- FN7: (REV)
- FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- AM: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL, FOSTER
- NR: JOHNSON, LEBON, CARPENTER, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
- DP: JOSEPHSON
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 16
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NEW TITLE 1DP 5NR 4AM
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HANNAN
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y15 N4 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 45(FIN)
- VERSION: CSSB 45(FIN)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CAL
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2022
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- NR: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI
- FIN RPT CS 3NR 1DP NEW TITLE
- FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- DP: HOFFMAN
- FN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- FN5: (REV)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: (REV)
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- AM: HOLLAND
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- L&C RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21