+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 9:51 A.M. 8/6/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/8 CHAPTER 18 SLA 19
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 9
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 44(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 N1 E2 A2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, SPOHNHOLZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 44(FIN)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
- FN3: (DHS)
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: CARPENTER, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ
- DP: JOHNSTON, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, WILSON
- PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 5DP 5NR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- FIN
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 44(FIN)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- ENGROSSED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 44(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILSON, BISHOP
- FIN RPT CS 7DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: SHOWER
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: REINBOLD, BISHOP, BIRCH, COSTELLO
- L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (3)
GIESSEL BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor