+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/6 CHAPTER 2 SLA 19
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 10:55 A.M. 4/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 41
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2019
- PASSED Y36 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 41
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: (AJS)
- NR: PRUITT
- DP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOHNSTON, THOMPSON, EASTMAN, KOPP
- RLS RPT 6DP 1NR
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: SB 41
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 41
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: (AJS)
- BISHOP
- DP: VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON,
- FIN RPT 9DP
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: (AJS)
- DP: HUGHES, REINBOLD, MICCICHE
- JUD RPT 3DP
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor