+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:50 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 66 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSSSSB 41(FIN) AM H
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 41(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y32 E4 A4
- ROKEBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON SAME DAY FAILED Y23 N9 E4 A4
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N25 E2 A3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: (HSS) RECEIVED
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 2NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, WHITAKER, STOLTZE,
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: BERKOWITZ, KERTTULA
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 41(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSSSB 41(FIN)
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, STEVENS B;
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: (HSS)
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH,
- OGAN, THERRIAULT
- FN1: (HSS)
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (HSS)
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN; NR: DAVIS
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
- HES, JUD, FIN
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, DYSON, STEVENS B,
- OGAN, COWDERY, SEEKINS, WAGONER
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, JUD, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor