+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- FN4: ZERO(UA)
- FN3: ZERO(EED)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: COGHILL
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DYSON, KELLY, STEVENS, FAIRCLOUGH, MICCICHE
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13