+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN6: ZERO(REV)
- FN5: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
- AM: KIEHL
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, SHOWER
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- DNP: KAWASAKI
- STA RPT CS 1DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: SHOWER
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: COSTELLO, REINBOLD
- AM: HOLLAND
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
- FN3: (REV)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor