+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 38
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 38
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/17 CAL
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2023
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FIN RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: OLSON, WILSON, MERRICK
- NR: KIEHL
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN7: ZERO(ADM)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: CLAMAN, GIESSEL, KAUFMAN
- NR: TOBIN, KIEHL
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: (ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, MERRICK, OLSON
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/23
+ − Sponsor
WILSON
Type:
Primary Sponsor