+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/17/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 75 SLA 04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 2:17 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 379(FIN)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y27 N1 A12
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 379(FIN)
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- DP: COGHILL, ROKEBERG; NR: MCGUIRE,
- RLS RPT 2DP 3NR
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
- MORGAN, KERTTULA
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- HB 544 SIMILAR BILL
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 379(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 379(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- STEVENS B; NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, BUNDE,
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT;
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
- NR: ELLIS, FRENCH, OGAN
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor