+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 97 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 10:34AM 6/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 376(HES) AM
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 376(HES) AM
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- FOSTER, HARRIS
- FIN RPT 2DP 8NR
- DP: MEYER, WILLIAMS; NR: HAWKER,
- STOLTZE, JOULE, CROFT, CHENAULT, FATE,
- FN4: (HSS)
- FN1: (HSS); FN2: (HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 376(HES)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- PASSED Y19 N1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- VERSION: CSSB 376(HES) AM
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, OLSON,
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 6DP
- FN2: (HSS)
- BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN1: (HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: (HSS)
- FN1: (HSS)
- DP: DYSON, DAVIS; NR: GUESS
- HES RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor