+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/8/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 19 SLA 02
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- 8:32AM 4/30/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 358
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y32 E3 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 358
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/02
On April 24, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- WILSON, KOHRING
- DP: MASEK, KOOKESH, KAPSNER, SCALZI,
- TRA RPT 6DP
On April 15, 2002 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 358
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 358
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/02
On April 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.TRA)
- NR: TAYLOR
- DP: COWDERY, WILKEN, ELTON, WARD;
- TRA RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor