+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 96 SLA 04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 12:09PM 6/14/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADOPTED H. FIN LETTER OF INTENT UC
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 357(FIN) AM H
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y10 N10
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 357(FIN)
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RECEDED FROM (H) AM Y23 N16 E1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- CRAWFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADOPTED H. FIN LETTER OF INTENT UC
- PASSED Y32 A8
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 357(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 3DP 6NR
- DP: FOSTER, CROFT, WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER,
- HAWKER, STOLTZE, FATE, CHENAULT, HARRIS
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RESCIND ADOPTING L&C HCS Y31 E1 A8
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 3NR
- DP: ROKEBERG, ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD,
- LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 357(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 357(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2004
On April 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: DYSON, OLSON, BUNDE
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: SEEKINS, DAVIS
- NR: BUNDE, FRENCH, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor