+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On July 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/18/94
- 9:10 AM 6/6/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 115 SLA 94
On April 29, 1994 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/94
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 350
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- VEZEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- -4 PREV SEN ZERO FNS (LAW,DPS,2-ADM) 3/9
- -PREVIOUS SENATE FISCAL NOTE (CORR) 3/9
- DP: NAVARRE, BROWN, THERRIAULT
- DP: PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF, HOFFMAN
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HANLEY, MARTIN
- FIN RPT 10DP
On April 22, 1994 in the House:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 350
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y15 N- E1 A4
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (ADM-2, DPS, LAW)
- PREVIOUS FN (CORR)
- FIN RPT 6DP
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FN (CORR)
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (ADM-2, DPS, LAW)
- ADDITIONAL REFERRAL TO FINANCE
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (ADM-2, DPS, LAW)
- PREVIOUS FN (CORR)
- STA RPT 2DP 1NR
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- ZERO FNS PUBLISHED (ADM-2, LAW, DPS)
- FISCAL NOTE PUBLISHED (CORR)
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor