+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/16/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/18 CHAPTER 1 SLA 99
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- 12:03 PM 3/3/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y32 E7 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 35(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/99
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, KOHRING,
- FIN RPT 9DP
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 2/5/99
- AUSTERMAN, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES,
- WILLIAMS, FOSTER
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 35(L&C)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/99
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- PETE KELLY, ADAMS, LEMAN, DONLEY
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, GREEN,
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) TO SB & CS
- NR: DONLEY
- DP: MACKIE, HOFFMAN, TIM KELLY, LEMAN;
- L&C RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor