+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 118 SLA 04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 2:17 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- PASSED Y35 N1 E1 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 349
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: SB 349
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CISSNA, WEYHRAUCH,
- GUTTENBERG, GARA
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, JOULE, CROFT, MOSES,
- FIN RPT 8DP 1NR
- FATE, FOSTER, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- FN1: (HSS)
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 349
- VERSION: SB 349
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, STEVENS G, SEEKINS
- LINCOLN, FRENCH, WAGONER,
- ELTON, ELLIS, GUESS, OLSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: (HSS)
- STEVENS B, DYSON
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON,
- FIN RPT 6DP
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: (HSS)
- FRENCH, STEVENS G
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, DAVIS,
- L&C RPT 5DP
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor